Accounts and annual returns NEW VALLEY PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1193912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 October 2023 02 September 2024 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2022 29 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2021 06 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2021 Not Required