AMUD YOMI L'ANASH

Charity number: 1194831
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TEACHING OF THE TORAH, TALMUD AND OTHER JEWISH TEXTS AND SCRIPTURES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ONLINE ANY SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES CHARITABLE IN LAW WHICH THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER WILL GENERALLY FOSTER THE SPIRIT AND PRACTICE OF TRADITIONAL JUDAISM.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £8,592
Total expenditure: £10,034

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 June 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Korer Chair 17 June 2021
LEYTONSTONE AND WANSTEAD SYNAGOGUE
Received: On time
Dr BRADLEY DAVIDOFF Trustee 17 June 2021
PESACH AND NECHAMA DAVIDOFF BUILDING FUND LIMITED
Received: On time
LUBAVITCH KOLLEL
Received: On time
SORA FELDMAN Trustee 17 June 2021
MIKVAH UK
Received: On time
FELDMAN INTERNATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £3.94k £8.59k
Total expenditure £0 £3.41k £10.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 November 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 November 2024 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
36A COLBERG PLACE
LONDON
N16 5RB
Phone:
07745538867
Website:

No information available