NORTHAMPTON EMERGENCY AID TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HUMAN LIFE AND PROPERTY IN PARTICULAR IN THE COMMUNITY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) SUPPORTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF FIRST AID TRAINING COURSES (2) ASSISTING EMERGENCY SERVICES AND CATEGORY 1 AND 2 RESPONDERS WITH THEIR EMERGENCY RESPONSE AND RECOVERY ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 December 2021: CIO registration
- NEAT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Douglas Dillow | Chair | 11 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Crow | Trustee | 11 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Harry Whiting | Trustee | 11 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam Chater | Trustee | 11 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.67k | £16.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.18k | £15.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HUMAN LIFE AND PROPERTY IN PARTICULAR IN THE COMMUNITY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) SUPPORTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF FIRST AID TRAINING COURSES (2) ASSISTING EMERGENCY SERVICES AND CATEGORY 1 AND 2 RESPONDERS WITH THEIR EMERGENCY RESPONSE AND RECOVERY ACTIVITIES (3) PROVIDING PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE, ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO LOCAL RESIDENTS, GROUPS AND BUSINESSES ON FIRST AID RELATED SUBJECTS AND (4) ENCOURAGING MORE YOUNG PEOPLE TO BECOME ENGAGED WITH THEIR COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY RESPONSE BY PROVIDING A YOUTH EDUCATION PROGRAMME
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 Martins Lane
Hardingstone
NORTHAMPTON
NN4 6DJ
- Phone:
- 01604807040
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window