QALAM ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS , QURAN READING CLASSES AND LECTURES TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE VALUES OF ISLAMIC RELIGION."
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 May 2021: CIO registration
- AL QALAM ACADEMY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Afzal Elahi Qureshi | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yaqoob Ahmad Bhat | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abdul qudoos Abbasi | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
wasif jehangir Kasher | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.96k | £61.93k | £80.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.07k | £49.41k | £66.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 May 2023 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 18 May 2023 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, QURAN READING CLASSES AND LECTURES TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE VALUES OF ISLAMIC RELIGION."
Contact information
- Address:
-
MASJID E USMAN MOSQUE
SHIRELAND ROAD
SMETHWICK
B66 4RG
- Phone:
- 01215655767
- Email:
- AEQ2020@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window