VOLT KNOWLEDGE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our foundation seeks to advance education and the traning of the public and to promote social and physical traning of people under the age of 25. We work with a broad range of educational and charitable establishments including but limited to colleges, universities, government agencies and professional training organisations across England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 September 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Danijela Vukovic | Chair | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Alexandra De Amorim Henriques Pires | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tanja Mihajlovska Dimitrievska | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC AND TO PROMOTE SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY ASSISTING CHARITIES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS WHOSE AIMS ALIGN WITH THE ABOVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 WILSON HOUSE
94 YORK ROAD
LONDON
SW11 3GU
- Phone:
- 07919231122
- Email:
- info@volt.org.uk
- Website:
-
volt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window