BERKSWELL CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parish of Berkswell and surrounding area. Provision of a site for a school in Berkswell; provision of Almshouse accommodation; donations to the CofE church in Berkswell for repairs to fabric and contents; further religious purposes; advancement of education of pupils in the principles of the CofE; other charitable purposes including relief of poverty; making grants to individuals/ organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Solihull
Governance
- 27 April 2021: CIO registration
- 02 March 2022: Funds received from 216605 BERKSWELL CHARITIES
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JOHN YATES | Chair | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
GRAHAM PARRY | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ALISON JEAN OLDHAM | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN MARGARET WALTON | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
NORMAN VINCENT CHILDS | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID STEWART BELL | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
JANE MARGARET EDWARDS | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER THOMAS POWELL BA, FCA | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Mark Quinn Bratton | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
BRENDAN PETER CONNOR OBE JP DL | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.40k | £325.70k | £419.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.40k | £266.46k | £322.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT: A (I) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A SITE FOR THE SCHOOL (WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE EDUCATION ACTS) IN OR NEAR BERKSWELL, WEST MIDLANDS; AND (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES, FACILITIES AND SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE AND ITS PUPILS. (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, INCLUDING BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION. (C) TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH BY MAINTAINING AND REPAIRING THE FABRIC AND CONTENTS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF BERKSWELL. (D) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES THINKS FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Meetinghouse Lane
Balsall Common
Coventry
- Phone:
- 07305585770
- Website:
-
BerkswellCharities.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window