FRIENDS OF THE WILMSLOW ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PTA collects donations from the parents of the students--this past year we had Letter's To Santa, Reading for Pleasure Scheme and various Crazy Days where the children come to school in various fancy dress. These Covid friendly activities all take place at school for the purpose of raising money for the school's Art's Week, Pantomime and books and school supplies for each year group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 July 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 30 March 2021: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF DEANOAKS (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Edwards | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/07/2022 | 21/07/2023 | 21/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.25k | £14.50k | £9.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.59k | £5.00k | £4.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 July 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 July 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 280 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 July 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 July 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WILMSLOW ACADEMY
HANDFORTH ROAD
WILMSLOW
SK9 2LX
- Phone:
- 01625383333
- Email:
- pta@thewilmslowacademy.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window