THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD THE ALL-SUFFICIENT SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RCCG The All-Sufficient Sanctuary is a church. Aside from religious activities, we are also into social actions to make our impact felt in the community. In recognition of this we have setup a Social Action department to perform charitable tasks in and around our community by providing basic needs and support to the frail, bedridden and vulnerable members of our community and to provide relevant p
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £22,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 23 September 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emmanuel Takpe | Trustee | 15 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josiah Adegbola | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Okugbeni | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.44k | £96.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.26k | £90.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 APR 2021
Charitable objects
6.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ("THE OBJECT") WHICH IS TO BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IS:- 6.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 VERNET GARDENS
OLDHAM
OL9 7EU
- Phone:
- 07853177189
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window