PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF GHANA MIDLANDS DISTRICT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly religious services include our Sunday service including a Sunday school for the younger attendees. We also hold Bible study meetings, religious seminars, religious counselling, fellowship group meetings for men, women and young adults, along with other meetings at which we share our religious beliefs and ethos with members and the wider public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADELAIDE ATU | Chair | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Edjekoomhene | Trustee | 07 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Owusu Kyeremateng | Trustee | 07 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Betty Oware | Trustee | 07 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.04k | £168.76k | £276.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.44k | £166.46k | £273.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT INCLUDING PROMOTING AN UNDERSTANDING OF EQUAL TREATMENT FOR ALL. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND POVERTY OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY PROVIDING GOODS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED, WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS, AND TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Stour Close
NEWPORT PAGNELL
Buckinghamshire
MK16 9DZ
- Phone:
- 07824880634
- Email:
- pcgmld@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window