Financial history DEEPDALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 517858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.70k £10.51k £26.40k £7.67k £14.31k
Total expenditure £12.44k £12.29k £27.91k £14.86k £12.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £602 N/A £2.58k