ERASMUS DARWIN WALK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAINTAINING THE DARWIN WALK THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WAYMARKERS, MAKING AMENDMENTS AS REQUIRED TO THE ROUTE DESRIPTION, MAINTAINING THE CHARITIES' ORCHARD AND ENSURING PATHS ARE CLEARED AS REQUIRED. PROMOTING THE MEMORY OF ERASMUS DARWIN THROUGH PUBLICATIONS AND PUBLICITY/INFORMATION TO THE PUBLIC. RUNNING FOUR ORGANISED WALKS EACH YEAR.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 28 August 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Pocock | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Jervis | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEITH GREAVES | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Stephen Sanders | Trustee | 01 April 1990 |
|
|||||
ROBIN GEOFFREY TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £128 | £91 | £52 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 JULY 1986
Charitable objects
(A) TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A FOOTPATH FOR THE NJOYMENT OF THE WHOLE OF THE CITY OF LICHFIELD AND TO PROVIDE IN THE IMMEDIATE VICINITY OF THE SAID FOOTPATH SUCH PLANTS, TREES, FLOWERS AND SHRUBS OF BOTANICAL INTRST. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING AND STIMULATING THEIR APPRECIATION AND STUBY OF THE LIFE AND WORKS OF ERASMUS DARWIN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Beechfield Rise
LICHFIELD
Staffordshire
WS13 6EL
- Phone:
- 01543263704
- Email:
- r.taylor@virgin.net
- Website:
-
darwinwalk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window