WISHFORD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the Charity are to advance the education of pupils attending schools within the Wishford Schools group in particular by establishing and maintaining educational scholarships, bursaries or grants and by awarding grants to develop and improve the educational and pastoral facilities of the schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penny Horsman | Chair | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Burrett | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil William Cufley | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £229.59k | £66.27k | £9.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78 | £304 | £64.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING SCHOOLS WITHIN THE WISHFORD SCHOOLS GROUP OR ITS SUCCESSOR ENTITIES OR SUCH OTHER SCHOOLS AS MAY BE APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A. ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING EDUCATIONAL SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR GRANTS TO BE AWARDED FROM TIME TO TIME AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT; AND B. AWARDING GRANTS TO DEVELOP AND IMPROVE THE EDUCATIONAL AND PASTORAL FACILITIES OF SUCH SCHOOLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WISHFORD SCHOOLS (GROUP) LIMITED
25-27 HIGH STREET
CORSHAM
SN13 0ES
- Phone:
- 01249713908
- Email:
- foundation@wishford.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window