FRIENDS OF SHIPTON MOYNE PARISH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Shipton Moyne Parish is a charitable Trust which has been established to enhance the community of the civil parish of Shipton Moyne.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 13 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD BOGGIS-ROLFE OBE | Chair | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS HORNBY | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Stuart Rutherford Dryden | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katie Elizabeth Mary Allies | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ELIZABETH BAKER | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|||||
IAN CARLING | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|||||
James Gresford Brodick Birdwood | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CHRISTOPHER ROBERT HALLPIKE | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.00k | £34.29k | £13.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.26k | £22.22k | £21.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2023
(These accounts |
16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF SHIPTON MOYNE, GLOUCESTERSHIRE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF SHIPTON MOYNE IN THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CHURCH") AND OF THE MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCH AND CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO THE CHURCH; AND GENERALLY PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH AND ITS CONTRIBUTION TO SHIPTON MOYNE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GLEBE HOUSE
SHIPTON MOYNE
TETBURY
GL8 8PW
- Phone:
- 01666880441
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window