LESBIAN IMMIGRATION SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a group of women in Greater Manchester who support lesbian and bisexual asylum seekers and refugees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 April 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 30 September 2021: Standard registration
- LISG (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prossy Kakooza | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Traies | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days | |
Annual return | 08 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days | |
Annual return | 08 April 2022 | 21 February 2024 | 378 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 MAR 2021 AS AMENDED ON 20 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE: A. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF LESBIAN AND BISEXUAL WOMEN LIVING IN GREATER MANCHESTER WHO ARE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS. B. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST LESBIAN AND BISEXUAL WOMEN LIVING IN GREATER MANCHESTER WHO ARE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o The Proud Trust
49-51 Sidney Street
MANCHESTER
M1 7HB
- Phone:
- 07503351922
- Email:
- lisg.manchester@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window