AN ANGEL OF GRACIE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Pallative children- With grants to help with getting home, or helping with support of end of life care. Bereaved families support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
Total income includes £1,852 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 September 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
russell jones | Chair | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
chloe jones-fouracre | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
eleanor jones | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
nichola dawson | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ryan fouracre | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
joanne jones | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.16k | £11.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.74k | £6.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £750 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 22 September 2024 | 326 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND TO RELIEVE SICKNESS OF CHILDREN AND BABIES UNDER THE AGE OF 18 WITH LIFE LIMITING ILLNESSES BY PROVIDING PALLIATIVE CARE SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO BE ABLE TO GO HOME FOR THE REMAINDER OF THEIR LIVES, HELPING TO GET IMPORTANT CARE EQUIPMENT TO GET THEM HOME, SUPPORTING BEREAVED PARENTS WITH COUNSELLING AND DROP IN CENTRES AND WITH THE LONG TERM OBJECTIVE OF ESTABLISHING A PALLIATIVE CARE HOME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 SMITH CLOSE
STEVENTON
ABINGDON
4 SMITH CLOSE
STEVENTON
OX13 6GD
- Phone:
- 07340383073
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window