WOODCHURCH MEMORIAL HALL TRUST

Charity Number: 1194883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The WMHT run a community building, providing the facilitates for a wide range of events and activities for the benefit and to improve the lives of local residents of all ages, without discrimination. WMHT holds classes; meetings & talks; events & shows; social gatherings; parties; private hire - all types.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £22,429
Total expenditure: £20,267

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wade James Nash Chair 21 June 2021
SIR EDWARD HALES' CHARITY (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS LEGGE FARM CHARITY)
Received: On time
WOODCHURCH WINDMILL TRUST
Received: On time
VILLAGE GREEN
Received: On time
WOODCHURCH MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
WOODCHURCH WINDMILL TRUST
Recently registered
WOODCHURCH VILLAGE GREEN
Recently registered
SIR EDWARD HALES' CHARITY (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS LEGGE FARM CHARITY)
Recently registered
WOODCHURCH HERITAGE TRUST
Received: 97 days late
WOODCHURCH MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
SYLVIA JOY RUBIE Trustee 16 May 2022
WOODCHURCH WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Received: On time
WOODCHURCH MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
Peter Wood Trustee 16 May 2022
WOODCHURCH MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
Leslie Fenton Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £0 £45.24k £21.92k £22.43k
Total expenditure £0 £8.04k £26.43k £20.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 18 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 18 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 September 2023 309 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 05 September 2023 309 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Woodchurch Memorial Hall
The Green
Woodchurch
Ashford
Kent
TN26 3PF
Phone:
07502220653