LIVINGSTONE LIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote human behaviour and the prevention of cruelty and suffering towards animals, in particular, but not limited to, African lions in captivity, by providing education and training and promoting best practices for those responsible for their care and the general public. We also fundraise to improve the welfare of captive lions where their needs have been compromised.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Zambia
Governance
- 01 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jacqueline Abell | Chair | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Dawn Channing | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rennie | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Gordon | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Andrews | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire O'Neill | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Brackstone | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sara Bylin | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karoline Sofie Traborg Bruun | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.27k | £8.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.97k | £8.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 23 August 2024 | 200 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING TOWARDS ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, AFRICAN LIONS IN CAPTIVITY, BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND PROMOTING BEST PRACTICES FOR THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR THEIR CARE 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO AFRICAN LIONS IN CAPTIVITY. 3. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE AFRICAN LION 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE AFRICAN LION
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Coniston Road
Coventry
CV5 6GU
- Phone:
- 07731451229
- Email:
- admin@livingstonelions.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window