HEART SAFE COMMUNITIES UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Heart Safe Communities UK operates within the United Kingdom to support communities in improving survival for those who experience a cardiac arrest outside of a hospital setting. This is achieved raising awareness of the causes and treatment of cardiac arrest, by providing resuscitation training and raising funds to install public access defibrillators in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 November 2021: CIO registration
- NASSINGTON HEART SAFE COMMUNITY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russell Bruce Hamilton | Chair | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Moira Elizabeth Webb | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Powell | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Hamilton MB ChB | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.42k | £6.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.84k | £3.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 09 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 09 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO CARDIAC HEALTH ISSUES AND THE NEED FOR PREVENTION AND APPROPRIATE TREATMENT AND REHABILITATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE LIVING, WORKING OR VISITING THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (A) PROMOTING THE CONCEPT, DEFINITION AND DEVELOPMENT OF COMMON STANDARDS LEADING TO A SINGLE UNIFIED ACCREDITATION PROCESS FOR ?HEART SAFE COMMUNITIES?. (B) BUILDING CAPACITY AND INSPIRING PEOPLE TO CREATE HEART SAFE COMMUNITIES (HSC) [CARING COMMUNITIES] BASED ON THE PRINCIPLES OF CARING COMMUNITIES, SAVING LIVES, EQUITY, INCLUSIVITY, FAIRNESS AND EQUALITY; THROUGH BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY (C) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC REGARDING HEALTH AND RELATED ISSUES AND/OR (D)THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC ON LIFE SAVING / SKILLS SUCH AS HOW TO PERFORM CARDIOPULMONARY RESUSCITATION (CPR) AND USE AN AED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO TRAINING THROUGHOUT COMMUNITIES INCLUDING SCHOOLS, SPORTS CLUBS, COMMUNITY GROUPS, AND ORGANISATIONS; AND / OR (E)THE PROVISION OF AUTOMATED EXTERNAL DEFIBRILLATORS (AED) AS PART OF STRATEGIC NETWORKS (PREDOMINANTLY PUBLIC ACCESS DEFIBRILLATORS AND OTHER EQUIPMENT NECESSARY FOR EMERGENCY CARE); AND/ OR (F)SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE BUSINESSES, ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER PREMISES TO RAISE AWARENESS, OFFER TRAINING, PROVIDE ACCESS TO AND SUPPORT THE PROVISION OF DEFIBRILLATORS; AND EQUIPMENT NECESSARY FOR EMERGENCY CARE (G)THE PROVISION/ FACILITATION OF CLEAR SIGNAGE AND INFORMATION THAT ENABLES LIFE SAVING EQUIPMENT TO BE FOUND AND ACCESSED AS QUICKLY AS POSSIBLE WHEN NEEDED (H) SEEKING OUT NEW, NOVEL AND INNOVATIVE WAYS TO DEVELOP HEART SAFE COMMUNITIES WHILE IMPROVING SPEED OF ACCESS, DELIVERY AND AWARENESS OF RELATED ISSUES; AND/OR (I) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE WAYS THE TRUSTEES, IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heart Safe Communities UK
The Old Bakery
27 Station Road
Nassington
Peterborough
PE8 6QB
- Phone:
- 03001020011
- Email:
- info@hscuk.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window