ANDY'S ANGELS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a Grief Play Cafe and an Intergenerational Bereavement Choir, in Worthing, West Sussex. The Cafe and Choir are safe spaces for children and their families, to come to be together, to not feel so isolated and have an opportunity to be around families going through similar experiences of loss.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michaela Shepherd | Chair | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Francoise Hall | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gail Waller | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Tomlinson | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Collet | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzie Hawker | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jenkins | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.50k | £27.39k | £42.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.38k | £18.02k | £29.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 March 2023 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 March 2023 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING CAUSED BY BEREAVEMENT/GRIEF THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND A FACILITY TO ENABLE PEOPLE AFFECTED, AND THEIR WIDER FAMILY TO OVERCOME GRIEF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 Findon Road
WORTHING
BN14 0AE
- Phone:
- 07818416448
- Email:
- andys.angels@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window