SOUTHWARK CATHEDRAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion for the public benefit, in particular but not exclusively by assisting in extending developing and maintaining the buildings, fabric, amenities and work of Southwark Cathedral, London Bridge, London, SE1 9DA and for such other charitable purposes (according to the laws of England and Wales) as the charity trustees see fit from time to time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Southwark
Governance
- 07 September 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Cornwell | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Lotwina Farodoye | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
The Venerable Jonathan Sedgwick | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP STURROCK | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Anne Page CBE | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
A)TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ASSISTING IN EXTENDING DEVELOPING AND MAINTAINING THE BUILDINGS, FABRIC, AMENITIES AND WORK (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO MUSIC AND MISSION, AT ANY LOCATION) OF SOUTHWARK CATHEDRAL WHICH IS LOCATED AT LONDON BRIDGE, LONDON SE1 9DA ('SOUTHWARK CATHEDRAL'); AND B)FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southwark Cathedral Office
Montague Chambers
Montague Close
LONDON
SE1 9DA
- Phone:
- 02073676732
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window