WHAT A WONDERFUL WORLD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
What a Wonderful World is based in Alnwick and its activities reach people across Northumberland. We ran a Climate Action Day in October 2021 in the run up to Cop26 and a full weekend festival of arts, science and the natural world in June 2022, June 2023 and June 2024 Planning is underway for a 4th festival June 27-29th 2025.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 November 2024
Total income includes £6,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northumberland
Governance
- 20 August 2021: CIO registration
- WAWW TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Christiane Jane Algar Ph.D | Chair | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
SIR WALTER JOHN BUCHANAN RIDDELL | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Thomas Edmund Burston | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR MILES ANDERSON | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANDERSON | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/11/2022 | 05/11/2023 | 05/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.14k | £11.34k | £16.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.19k | £9.77k | £14.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £750 | £1.69k | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 November 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 November 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 November 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES IN NORTHUMBERLAND AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS ON THE SUBJECTS OF CLIMATE CHANGE AND BIODIVERSITY LOSS, INCLUDING THEIR POTENTIAL IMPACTS AND HOW THEY MAY BE ADDRESSED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FESTIVALS AND SIMILAR EDUCATIONAL EVENTS THAT WILL INCLUDE PUBLIC LECTURES, TALKS, WORKSHOPS AND ARTISTIC PERFORMANCES RELATED TO THOSE TOPICS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST VIEW MOUNT HOOLEY
WHITTINGHAM
ALNWICK
NE66 4RN
- Phone:
- 01665574631
- Email:
- Info@whataww.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window