THE HUNGARIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes social inclusion for the benefit of the public among people from Hungary who are residing in the UK and who are socially excluded or at risk of social exclusion because of their social and economic background by assisting them to integrate into society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 August 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Balazs Fekete | Chair | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoltan Fulop | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zsanett Banyik | Trustee | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £505 | £250 | £3.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35 | £60 | £420 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 March 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 29 March 2024 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
‘TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AMONG PEOPLE FROM HUNGARY WHO ARE RESIDING IN THE UK AND WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED OR AT RISK OF SOCIAL EXCLUSION BECAUSE OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC BACKGROUND BY ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH: - PROVIDING ONLINE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE; - WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT; - SUPPORT AND ADVICE IN MONEY MANAGEMENT AND FINANCIAL MATTERS; - PROVIDING WORKSHOPS AND MENTORING PROGRAMMES WHICH PROVIDE EMPLOYABILITY SKILLS TO ENTER THE WORKFORCE AND PROVIDE ASSISTANCE IN ENTERING HIGHER EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Chaddesley Close
REDDITCH
Worcestershire
B98 7ND
- Phone:
- 07716314651
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window