CONTEMPORARY BRITISH SILVERSMITHS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CBS Charity will focus on encouraging and improving the craft and preserving the artistry of silversmithing. For the purposes of the Charity silversmithing is defined as the creation of wrought articles, typically in silver or its allied materials, not generally to be worn on the body. The CIO will run professional development and training courses in connection with silversmithing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 June 2021: CIO registration
- CBS CHARITY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashley Peter Pover | Chair | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nichole Karen Herbert Wood | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Dougall | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Newton | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Fleming | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
John O'Loughlin | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Andrew Damien Knight | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.20k | £33.24k | £21.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.40k | £31.99k | £3.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE, MAINTAIN AND DEVELOP ART, CRAFT, DESIGN AND ARTISAN SKILLS RELATING PRIMARILY TO SILVERSMITHING, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE FOSTERING, PROMOTION AND EXPANSION OF THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH ART, CRAFT, DESIGN AND ARTISAN SKILLS. SILVERSMITHING IS DEFINED AS THE CREATION OF WROUGHT ARTICLES, TYPICALLY IN SILVER OR ITS ALLIED MATERIALS, NOT GENERALLY TO BE WORN ON THE BODY BUT INSTEAD ARTICLES OF A SCULPTURAL OR UTILITARIAN NATURE WHICH ARE PREDOMINATELY DESIGNED AND CREATED BY HAND OR THROUGH MECHANISED TECHNIQUES TO CREATE UNIQUE OBJECTS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Chris Knight
PERSISTENCE WORKS
21 BROWN STREET
SHEFFIELD
S1 2BS
- Phone:
- 07931524272
- Email:
- admin@CBSCharity.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window