METHERINGHAM AIRFIELD VISITOR CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND PROVIDE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE BUILDINGS, OTHER CONSTRUCTIONS AND RELATED HISTORIC ARTEFACTS FORMING PART THE FORMER METHERINGHAM AIRFIELD AS DEFINED IN THE LEASE AND IN CONNECTION WITH 106 SQUADRON OF THE ROYAL AIR FORCE, NO. 5 GROUP BOMBER COMMAND, THE ROYAL AIR FORCE AND RAF METHERINGHAM AND BY TH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
49 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 05 May 2021: CIO registration
- 19 December 2022: Funds received from 1084720 THE FRIENDS OF METHERINGHAM AIRFIELD
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Kitchen | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Walker | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Palmer | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Parker | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caterina Scott | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Ann Guest | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SCOLEY | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.54k | £31.03k | £53.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.44k | £11.37k | £50.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND PROVIDE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE BUILDINGS, OTHER CONSTRUCTIONS AND RELATED HISTORIC ARTEFACTS FORMING PART THE FORMER METHERINGHAM AIRFIELD AS DEFINED IN THE LEASE AND IN CONNECTION WITH 106 SQUADRON OF THE ROYAL AIR FORCE, NO. 5 GROUP BOMBER COMMAND, THE ROYAL AIR FORCE AND RAF METHERINGHAM AND BY THE EXHIBITION AND PUBLIC DISPLAY OF HISTORIC AND INFORMATIVE COLLECTIONS RELATING THERETO.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Metheringham Airfield Visitor Centre
Martin Moor
Metheringham
LINCOLN
LN4 3WF
- Phone:
- 07869 267487
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window