INCLUSIVE LIFE PROJECTS

Charity number: 1195760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Informal networking meetings to share experience, advice, and activities to support carers with our respite relaxation sessions. We facilitate the participation of disabled people in sport, the involvement of disabled people in sport is significantly lower than that of non-disabled people. We offer the sport activity Boccia, which is a target ball sport which tests both muscle control and accuracy

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £309
Total expenditure: £623

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 September 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • CONVERGENCE INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Beatrice Imielska Chair 30 June 2018
None on record
Malgorzata Diakite Trustee 30 June 2018
None on record
Peting Dittieman Diarra Trustee 30 June 2018
None on record
Arkadiusz Imielski Trustee 30 June 2018
None on record
PATRYK IMIELSKI Trustee 30 June 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.64k £760 £309
Total expenditure £1.32k £441 £623
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 LITTLE MEADOW WALK
BIRMINGHAM
B33 8DR
Phone:
00
Website:

No information available