HIGH PEAK COMMUNITY ARTS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Creates opportunities for the people of the High Peak and neighbourhood to participate in creative arts and so enhance their quality of life through self-expression, focusing on people who do not have access to the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,316 from 3 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 26 August 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Walmsley | Chair | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melody Slinn | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lidija McKnight | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Emma Richardson | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Bellis | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Nathan | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Ann Young | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Worrall | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Storr | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Maia Preston | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAWN BRYAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £219.55k | £204.96k | £284.14k | £221.89k | £287.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.66k | £192.37k | £292.00k | £258.22k | £232.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.41k | £19.51k | £19.01k | £19.51k | £15.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 JULY 1986
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF HIGH PEAK AND NEIGHBOURHOOD THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF COMMUNITY ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, BALLET, OPERA, MUSIC, SINGING, LITERATURE, SCULPTURE AND PAINTING.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF HIGH PEAK AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 2
Unit 10
Bingswood Business Park
Whaley Bridge
High Peak
SK23 7LY
- Phone:
- 01663744516
- Email:
- mail@highpeakarts.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window