Aspirations Day Program

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aspirations Program offers a range of abstinence-based recovery support services for people affected directly or indirectly by addiction(s). This includes a structured, non-residential, non-religious program led by trauma-informed trained staff, support for family members, specialist support for women who sell sex in a gender-informed environment, and support for young people aged 18-30.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 06 August 2021: CIO registration
- ASPIRATIONS PROGRAM COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY (CIC) (Working name)
- ASPIRATIONS PROGRAM CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TRACY JANE HARRIS | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Snow | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Blackburn | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE JACKIE EMERTON | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PHILIP GOSNELL | Trustee | 26 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.39k | £307.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.78k | £264.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.03k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Aug 2021 as amended on 31 May 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE RELIEF OF NEED AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE IN RECOVERY FROM HARMFUL ADDICTIONS AND OTHER MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES TO FULLY SUPPORT THEM WITH THEIR RECOVERY, AND RE-INTEGRATE WITH SOCIETY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
573 SOUTHCHURCH ROAD
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
ESSEX
SS1 2PN
- Phone:
- 01702 463592
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window