Trustees Aspirations Day Program

Charity number: 1195424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TRACY JANE HARRIS Trustee 18 February 2025
None on record
Louisa Snow Trustee 29 October 2024
None on record
Heather Blackburn Trustee 05 June 2024
None on record
CHRISTINE JACKIE EMERTON Trustee 06 September 2023
None on record
JOHN PHILIP GOSNELL Trustee 26 August 2023
None on record