DAME VERA LYNN MEMORIAL STATUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is raising funds to erect a memorial by renowned sculptor Paul Day to acknowledge the heroic and noble deeds carried out by Dame Vera Lynn throughout her life. The memorial is linked to Dover District Council's project to create an amphitheatre on the cliffs at Dover, by connecting Dame Vera Lynn's memorial to an open air concert venue her music legacy will live on for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 May 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN TOM JONES | Chair | 09 April 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Simon Gorham | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Julie Kathleen Cushion | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Graham Robinson | Trustee | 09 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
VIRGINIA LEWIS-JONES | Trustee | 09 April 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £566.72k | £21.15k | £38.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.72k | £282.33k | £271.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £566.72k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £57.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £14.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.74k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 May 2021
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND TO ADVANCE ART FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE CREATION, ERECTION, AND MAINTENANCE OF A STATUE OF DAME VERA LYNN, MEMORIALISING THE HEROIC AND NOBLE DEEDS CARRIED OUT BY DAME VERA LYNN THROUGHOUT HER LIFE. (B)TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO CHARITABLE CAUSES PREVIOUSLY SUPPORTED BY DAME VERA LYNN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
84 VALEBRIDGE ROAD
BURGESS HILL
RH15 0RP
- Phone:
- 01444235475
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window