TESTLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF SOUTHAMPTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £174,458 from 2 government grant(s)
People

25 Employee(s)
3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 01 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Newman | Chair | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Mark Bigwood | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Joseph John Crook | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.68k | £621.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.54k | £418.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £174.46k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £446.98k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £374.13k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £44.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £1.55k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £269.55k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £52.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 January 2024 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 January 2024 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF SOUTHAMPTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Testlands Hub
Green Lane
SOUTHAMPTON
SO16 9FQ
- Phone:
- 02382026700
- Email:
- contactus@testlands.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window