Accounts and annual returns THE CHRIS MBULU TRUST

Charity number: 1196011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 26 May 2024 20 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 May 2024 20 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 26 May 2023 15 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 May 2023 15 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 26 May 2022 06 April 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 26 May 2022 06 April 2023 11 days late Download Open in new window