Trustees BANGLADESHI BRITISH CIVIL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1196425
Charity reporting is up to date (78 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
AHMED ALI Chair 05 November 2021
None on record
MD MAHBUBUL ISLAM Trustee 05 November 2021
None on record
SYED AHMED ALI Trustee 05 November 2021
None on record
Nipa Choudhury Trustee 26 March 1974
None on record
MD Shaid Jahangir Bin-Wali Trustee 21 February 1967
None on record
Monsur Ahmed Khan Trustee 16 December 1959
None on record
Sultana Radhia Ali Trustee 15 June 1959
None on record
Anwar Ahmed Choudhury Trustee 02 January 1956
None on record