PRIDE IN STEM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pride in STEM organises talks, events, and conferences showcasing LGBTQIA people in STEM. It also produces digital content to achieve the aims of the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 16 November 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 February 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alfredo Carpineti | Chair | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mx Olukemi Oloyede | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eleanor Sophie Armstrong | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mx Ashar Ali Aslam | Trustee | 04 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Craig Poku | Trustee | 28 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MX LARA LALEMI | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ashley Spindler | Trustee | 28 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Joseph Razzell Hollis | Trustee | 17 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jake Taylor | Trustee | 30 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mx Christopher Morgan Carpineti | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 16/11/2022 | 16/11/2023 | 16/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.09k | £19.07k | £13.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.77k | £13.91k | £17.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 16 November 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 November 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 November 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 November 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING AND MEDICAL (STEM) FIELDS BY, AMONG OTHER THINGS: A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY IN STEM FIELDS; B) RAISING AWARENESS OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER ROLE MODELS IN THE STEM FIELDS AND ADVANCING EDUCATION, ESPECIALLY EDUCATIONS RELATED TO THEIR WORK; C) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSION EVENTS TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING OF THE CONTRIBUTIONS OF LGBT PEOPLE TO THE STEM FIELDS; AND D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Cunard Apartments
1 Picture House Mews
LONDON
E17 3GW
- Phone:
- 07515355042
- Email:
- info@prideinstem.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window