THE REFUGEE EMPLOYMENT NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Refugee Employment Network (REN) brings together non-profits, local authorities and businesses to ensure refugees in the UK have access to appropriate, fulfilling, paid work or self-employment opportunities. Founded in 2019, our organisation is the only national membership network in the UK exclusively focused on creating better opportunities for refugees across the whole country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janice Lopatkin | Chair | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris Fitzgerald LVO | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Fraser | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Frances Bailey | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
AKEELA AHMED BSC, MSC | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Ridley | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nour Eddin Al Talli | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Bowles | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.37k | £95.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.35k | £33.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Oct 2021 as amended on 12 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
3.1.1. the relief of unemployment and underemployment of Beneficiaries, by: a. the provision of effective vocational and skills training, advice and support, both to Beneficiaries and, more commonly, the third parties with which they come into contact, including without limitation local authorities, central government departments, non-governmental organisations, prospective employers and charities; b. the provision of advice and guidance to employers seeking to train and recruit Beneficiaries; and c. the dissemination, to local authorities, central government departments, non-governmental organisations, prospective employers, charities and any other relevant organisation, of guidance and best practice regarding employment and self-employment as they affect Beneficiaries; 3.1.2. to advance the education and training of Beneficiaries and in each case their dependants, so as to advance them in life and enable them to adapt and thrive within a new community; 3.1.3. to advance the education of employers and the general public around issues relating Beneficiaries, in order to better enable such Beneficiaries to build their lives in the United Kingdom; and 3.1.4. to relieve financial hardship amongst Beneficiaries, particularly by the provision of legal and practical advice and guidance relating to employment and self-employment; and 3.1.5. the relief of unemployment generally, in each case for the public benefit. "Beneficiaries" means (a) individuals who have at any time been granted legal refugee status in any country who are resident in the United Kingdom, (b) individuals granted leave to remain in the United Kingdom having fled conflict, persecution or any other actual or potential humanitarian crisis in another country, (c) to the extent such individuals are permitted to work in the United Kingdom, those seeking asylum in the United Kingdom, and (d) individuals who hold British citizenship but who have met one or more of these criteria in the past.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 CREWYS ROAD
LONDON
NW2 2AD
- Phone:
- 07887865404
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window