MARTIN HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing holistic care and support to children and young people with life limiting illnesses and to their families in Yorkshire and the Humber.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income:
£13,757,000
Donations and legacies | £8.06m | |
Charitable activities | £1.91m | |
Other trading activities | £3.42m | |
Investments | £332.00k | |
Other | £46.00k |
Total expenditure:
£10,815,981
Raising funds | £3.63m | |
Charitable activities | £6.47m | |
Other | £718.10k |
£493,194 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,904,580 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.35m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.47m | |
Retained for future use | £2.94m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.35m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.47m | |
Retained for future use | £3.43m |
People

211 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
260 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- City Of York
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Lewis | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yasmin Zohra Ayesha Khan | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shiela Clare Puri | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jayne Price | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Singer | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tim Straughan | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER SLEE | Trustee | 12 February 2013 |
|
|||||
TIMOTHY JAMES HALSTEAD | Trustee | 06 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOSEPH PAUL MILLINGTON | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN STEPHEN PLEWS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.83m | £7.93m | £8.15m | £10.26m | £13.76m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.17m | £7.86m | £9.09m | £9.92m | £10.82m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £505.48k | £1.27m | £1.86m | £1.87m | £1.90m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.33m | £3.60m | £3.33m | £4.83m | £8.06m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.15m | £1.31m | £2.52m | £3.09m | £3.42m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.67m | £0 | £1.86m | £1.90m | £1.91m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £498.56k | £408.31k | £372.34k | £403.28k | £332.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £185.56k | £2.61m | £76.87k | £40.33k | £46.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.38m | £1.79m | £1.24m | £1.16m | £1.11m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.90m | £5.59m | £5.78m | £6.28m | £6.47m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.28m | £2.27m | £3.31m | £3.64m | £3.63m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.43k | £18.15k | £17.87k | £21.78k | £47.83k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £158.13k | £159.82k | £111.84k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £59.47k | £61.54k | £70.40k | £52.27k | £30.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £718.10k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.93m | £3.87m | £4.18m | £4.58m | £6.80m | |
|
Long-term investments | £15.74m | £19.17m | £18.51m | £16.89m | £17.38m | |
|
Other assets | £3.50m | £3.54m | £2.12m | £3.02m | £4.29m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.63m | £1.58m | £1.39m | £1.39m | £1.93m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 MAY 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 JULY 1994, 27 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 DECEMBER 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JUL 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO PROMOTING, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL HEALTH BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND AND ADJACENT AREAS IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, WHETHER GEOGRAPHICAL OR OTHERWISE) BY: A) PROVIDING PALLIATIVE CARE, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND INFORMATION TO YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LIFE LIMITING OR LIFE THREATENING CONDITIONS AND PROVIDING ADVICE, SUPPORT AND INFORMATION TO THE FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND CARERS (INCLUDING HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PROFESSIONALS) OF SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE; B) PROVIDING, ENCOURAGING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION AND EXPRESSION OF RELIGIOUS, SPIRITUAL, SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL, HOLISTIC OR OTHER HELP AND GUIDANCE IN THE CONTEXT OF THE DELIVERY OF PALLIATIVE CARE; C) PROMOTING AND ADVANCING THE PROVISION OF PALLIATIVE CARE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH EDUCATION, RAISING AWARENESS, RESEARCH AND TRAINING; AND D) PROMOTING AND ADVANCING BEST PRACTICE IN THE PROVISION OF CARE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LIFE LIMITING OR LIFE THREATENING CONDITIONS.
Area of benefit
NORTH OF ENGLAND AND ADJACENT AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARTIN HOUSE
GROVE ROAD
CLIFFORD
WETHERBY
LS23 6TX
- Phone:
- 01937845045
- Email:
- resources@martinhouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window