PAWPURRS HALFWAY HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PawPurrs Halfway House rescues cats off the streets and from homes where owners are unable to take care of them. We started in 2020 at the start of lockdown and have grown considerably, gaining charity status in December 2021. We rescue strays, toms, cats in need, and pregnant cats, aiming to socialise and rehabilitate them before they are appropriately re-homed, matching them to the right home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miss Katie Hayes | Chair | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Davidson | Trustee | 02 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Oneisa Akuji | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Robertshaw | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 162 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS CATS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL-USAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6A CORKLAND ROAD
MANCHESTER
M21 8UT
- Phone:
- 07404482342
- Website:
-
pawpurrs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window