CORNHILL COMMUNITY ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manages the Cornhill on Tweed Centre on behalf of the Parish Council. It is an 'umbrella' organisation for other groups within the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 May 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northumberland
Governance
- 19 May 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Richard Devon | Chair | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Crouch | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ian Crouch | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie-Louise Georgina Brown | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Dunlop Read | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Elizabeth Devon | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/05/2022 | 18/05/2023 | 18/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200 | £50.19k | £30.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £586 | £47.89k | £37.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.00k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 May 2024 | 09 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 May 2024 | 09 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 May 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 May 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 May 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 May 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE GREEN AND COMMUNITY FACILITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE PARISH OF CORNHILL IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHUMBERLAND, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cornhill On Tweed Centre
CORNHILL-ON-TWEED
Northumberland
TD12 4UE
- Phone:
- 01890882578
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window