BOLTON COMMUNITY KITCHEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bolton Community Kitchen. Our main purpose and objective is to provide hot and nourishing cooked meals to people who are either homeless or living in hostels. Although nobody is ever turned away. Our second objective is to fund, support and manage an allotment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bolton
Governance
- 28 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Bradbury | Chair | 09 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jayne Watson | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MOLONEY | Trustee | 09 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Alan Brown | Trustee | 09 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.80k | £16.45k | £2.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.04k | £13.50k | £16.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 December 2023 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 December 2023 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 December 2023 | 407 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 December 2023 | 407 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST PEOPLE IN BOLTON IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED; B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT(SCOTLAND)ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Area of benefit
BOLTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 Pansy Road
Farnworth
BOLTON
BL4 0EW
- Phone:
- 07861781040
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window