OUSEBURN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 1195661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Ouseburn Community Centre provides a community facility for use by the general public, voluntary, statutory and commercial operators with social benefit at their core. We work in partnership with a range of providers catering to people of all ages, denominations and needs. We have a strong working relationship with Hotspur Primary School providing parents with much needed childcare after school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £53,532
Total expenditure: £49,262

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 August 2021: CIO registration
  • 15 November 2022: Funds received from 512540 OUSEBURN COMMUNITY CENTRE
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN POWERS Chair 16 December 2021
None on record
Walter Morauf Trustee 16 December 2021
None on record
JUNE CONWAY Trustee 16 December 2021
COMMUNITY ORCHARD GREENSIDE
Recently registered
KEVIN ANDERSON Trustee 16 December 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.77k £47.60k £53.53k
Total expenditure £41.16k £59.24k £49.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.60k £5.53k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 March 2024 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 March 2024 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ouseburn Community Centre
Mowbray Street
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE6 5PA
Phone:
01912759950
Website:

No information available