WIDNES GYMNASTICS ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation, and in particular facilities for participation in the sport of gymnastics, in the interests of social welfare for young people under the age of 18 living in Cheshire and the surrounding area who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth or age with a view to improving the conditions of life of such persons
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 28 June 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Wood | Chair | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lexi Wood | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Longworth | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ben Smith | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.19k | £151.23k | £178.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.87k | £152.40k | £163.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.64k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 31 December 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 31 December 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 FEB 2019 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, AND IN PARTICULAR FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORT OF GYMNASTICS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 18 LIVING IN CHESHIRE WEST AND CHESHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR AGE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WIDNES GYMNASTICS CLUB
WITT ROAD
WIDNES
WA8 7RU
- Phone:
- 01514200896
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window