Governing document Tara International Kadampa Retreat Centre LTD

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/08/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/04/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/12/2011 as amended on 07 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BUDDHIST FAITH OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - PRINCIPALLY THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF STUDY, PRACTICE,TEACHING AND THE OBSERVANCE OF MORAL DISCIPLINE BASED ON THE CONTINUOUS IMPLEMENTATION OF THE THREE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION STUDY PROGRAMMES DEFINED IN THE ARTICLES. THESE ACTIVITIES SHALL ALL BE WITHIN THE PURE TRADITION OF MAHAYANA BUDDHISM OF ATISHA AND JE TSONGKHAPA AS TAUGHT BY VENERABLE GESHE KELSANG GYATSO.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.