GREATER MANCHESTER SOUTH ASIAN WOMEN'S OUT OF HOURS SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relive the distress and suffering of women, in particular, women of South Asian ethnicity, who have suffered or who are exposed to domestic violence or other forms of abuse, through the provision of a support helpline, drop-in support sessions, education and through delivering training sessions and advice to other organisations and services on domestic violence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Tameside
Governance
- 13 August 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shahida Begum | Chair | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marya Javed | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Saima Suleman | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £29.13k | £46.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £12.39k | £18.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF WOMEN, IN PARTICULAR, WOMEN OF SOUTH ASIAN ETHNICITY, WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR WHO ARE EXPOSED TO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE OR OTHER FORMS OF ABUSE, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A SUPPORT HELPLINE, DROP-IN SUPPORT SESSIONS, EDUCATION AND THROUGH DELIVERING TRAINING SESSIONS AND ADVICE TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND SERVICES ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
288 FREDERICK STREET
OLDHAM
OL8 4HG
- Phone:
- 07947157215
- Email:
- ahmed_seher@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
gmsaw.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window