Financial history EAST DURHAM GROUNDWORK TRUST

Charity Number: 517952
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £3.53m £2.78m £2.56m £2.08m £384.96k
Total expenditure £3.50m £2.76m £2.56m £2.03m £104.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £65.65k £65.40k £65.40k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £2.71m £2.50m £2.01m N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £647 £522 £1.08k N/A
Income - Other N/A £5.36k £0 £6.84k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £2.68m £2.48m £1.95m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £65.04k £71.10k £78.33k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £635.95k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A