Fishguard Festival of Music Gwyl Gerdd Aberwaun Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the education and knowledge of the arts generally in Wales in particular by the promotion of concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £50,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 06 October 1986: Standard registration
- FISHGUARD INTERNATIONAL MUSIC FESTIVAL (Working name)
- Fishguard and West Wales International Music Festival Gwyl Gerdd Ryngwladol Abergwaun a Gorllewin Cymru (Previous name)
- FISHGUARD INTERNATIONAL MUSIC FESTIVAL GWYL GERDD RYNGWLADOL ABERGWAUN (Previous name)
- FISHGUARD MUSIC FESTIVAL (GWYL GERDD ABERGWAUN) (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bronwen Picton Jones | Chair |
|
||||||
David Keith Bartlett | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sara Forman | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Morris | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr GLEN PETERS | Trustee | 22 December 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.78k | £38.54k | £51.03k | £103.48k | £93.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.60k | £21.58k | £64.29k | £124.97k | £92.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £50.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.70k | £36.00k | £30.50k | £50.00k | £50.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 February 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 February 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/07/1986 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28/11/2011 as amended on 25 Nov 2019 as amended on 07 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE ARTS GENERALLY IN WALES PARTICULARLY BY THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATIONAL MUSICAL CONCERTS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF MUSIC, BALLET, SINING, DRAMA, MIME, DANCING AND THE FORMULATION, PREPARATION AND ESTABLISHMENT OF SCHEMES THEREFOR.
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o JD Jones & Co
71 High Street
Fishguard
SA65 9AW
- Phone:
- 01348873237
- Email:
- bpjones.fimf@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window