PEOPLE OF THE STREETS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is currently dormant, but its aim is to change perceptions of people with lived experience of homelessness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Bream McIntosh | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kamille Fijalkowski | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER GREENHALGH POTS | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 364 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE WHO ARE HOMELESS, BY USING THE ARTS, PARTICULARLY THE VISUAL AND NARRATIVE ARTS, AS A WAY OF EMPOWERING UNDER-REPRESENTED COMMUNITIES TO DEVELOP NEW SKILLS AND HAVE THEIR VOICES BETTER HEARD IN SOCIETY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Horsfield Smith
Tower House
269 Walmersley Road
BURY
Lancashire
BL9 6NX
- Phone:
- 07876798359
- Email:
- alex@pots.group
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window