FREEDOM CHURCH NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Freedom Church Bristol is a Free Methodist Church meeting in Kingswood Bristol, holding a variety of regular church services, educational services, services to relieve financial hardship, public outreach, missionary work and the establishment of new churches according to the same basis of faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,100 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 September 2021: CIO registration
- FREEDOM CHURCH BRISTOL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David A Hull | Chair | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Simon Fleet | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian John Lewis | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bernice Whybrew | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.43k | £82.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.51k | £119.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £3.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED ON REGISTERED ON 29 SEP 2021 AMENDED TO CIO FOUNDATION 14 APR 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, AS EXPRESSED IN THE “ARTICLES OF RELIGION OF THE FREE METHODIST CHURCH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM” (AS PRESENTLY SET OUT IN THE APPENDIX TO THE CHARITY’S CONSTITUTION AND WITHIN THE FREE METHODIST CHURCH BOOK OF DISCIPLINE) AND THE FURTHERANCE OF THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE FREE METHODIST CHURCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES, DISCIPLINES AND USAGES OF THAT CHURCH FOR THE TIME BEING AS SET FORTH IN THE BOOK OF DISCIPLINE, CARRIED OUT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO HOLDING A VARIETY OF REGULAR CHURCH SERVICES, EDUCATIONAL SERVICES, GRANTS TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, PUBLIC OUTREACH, MISSIONARY WORK AND THE ESTABLISHMENT OF NEW CHURCHES ACCORDING TO THE SAME BASIS OF FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Freedom Church ACORN HOUSE
KINGSWOOD ESTATE
Britannia Road
Kingswood
BS15 8DB
- Phone:
- 01173365298
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window