Financial history THE ESK VALLEY LIFELINE

Charity number: 517963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/10/2020 19/10/2021 19/10/2022 19/10/2023 19/10/2024
Total gross income £8.50k £4.79k £17.49k £10.04k £10.45k
Total expenditure £8.41k £6.59k £6.64k £11.53k £11.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A