Trustees THE ESK VALLEY LIFELINE
Charity number: 517963

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dianne Lea Wright | Chair | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lewis | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lillie | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Christine Rudsdale | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Michael Rudsdale | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANNE MARTYN-JOHNS | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.