FARNHAM LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity Number: 1194104
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants are made to assist individuals, organisations and charities within the Farnham and Haslemere areas. and to support projects sponsored by the Lions District and Multiple District, and international appeals by Lions Clubs International. A number of community service projects are carried out and a number of fundraising events are held.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £138,261
Total expenditure: £147,733

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 April 2021: CIO registration
  • 24 January 2022: Funds received from 290242 LIONS CLUB OF FARNHAM CHARITY TRUST FUND
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Moran-Smith Chair 20 September 2023
None on record
Alyson Helen Gail Deadman Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Richard Keith Fellows Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Jane Elizabeth Langton Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
John Peter Raymond Prevost Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Michael Rory Ellis Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Raymond Edwin Richard Brown Trustee 23 March 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £123.30k £270.52k £138.26k
Total expenditure £119.42k £174.73k £147.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £33.42k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 09 May 2025 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 09 May 2025 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 25 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 25 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 23 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 23 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hopfield House
24 Cascade Way
FARNHAM
Surrey
Phone:
03458337848