THE CABE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Benevolent Fund to help Members and former Members of the Chartered Association of Building Engineers in distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Hong Kong
- Ireland
- Macau
- Malaysia
- New Zealand
- Singapore
- United States
Governance
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Wadood | Chair | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GRINYER | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID KITTCATT | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
KABBE NJIE | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG WILDE | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
TONY HARVEY-SOANES | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hall FCABE | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Anne Menzies | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.72k | £21.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.18k | £13.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 July 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 July 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE RELIEF IN DISTRESSED CIRCUMSTANCES OF MEMBERS, RETIRED MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE SAID BODY CORPORATE CALLED THE ASSOCIATION OF BUILDING ENGINEERS (FORMERLY CALLED THE INCORPORATED ASSOCIATION OF ARCHITECTS AND SURVEYORS) AND THE BODY CORPORATE CALLED CHARTERED ASSOCIATION OF BUILDING ENGINEERS AND OF WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS AND CHILDREN AND OTHER IMMEDIATE DEPENDANTS IN DISTRESSED CIRCUMSTANCES OF DECEASED MEMBERS, RETIRED MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE SAID BODIES CORPORATE. FORMER MEMBERS SHALL HAVE AT LEAST 15 YEARS CONTINUOUS MEMBERSHIP
Contact information
- Address:
-
CABE
LUTYENS HOUSE
BILLING BROOK ROAD
NORTHAMPTON
NN3 8NW
- Phone:
- 01604404121
- Email:
- Alison.Lodge@cbuilde.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window